Global Patent Index - EP 0801569 A4

EP 0801569 A4 2000-01-19 - METHOD FOR PROTECTING THE HEART FROM ISCHEMIA

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PROTECTING THE HEART FROM ISCHEMIA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ DES HERZENS WÄRHEND ISCHÄMIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PROTEGER LE COEUR CONTRE L'ISCHEMIE

Publication

EP 0801569 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95944379 A

Priority

  • US 9516749 W
  • US 36240094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9619225A1] A therapeutic and prophylactic method for protection of heart or heart tissue by limiting metabolic and ionic abnormalities developed during, following or associated with ischemia by administering to a subject in need either a compound which reduces NADH/NAD<+> ratio and stimulates glycolysis to produce ATP or a compound which inhibits cotransporter of sodium-potassium-chloride.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/535; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/196 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/402 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/455 (2006.01); A61K 31/502 (2006.01); A61K 31/5415 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/5415 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/196 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/341 (2013.01); A61K 31/402 (2013.01); A61K 31/426 (2013.01); A61K 31/44 (2013.01); A61K 31/455 (2013.01); A61K 31/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9619225 A1 19960627; EP 0801569 A1 19971022; EP 0801569 A4 20000119; US 5834466 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970714

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE