Global Patent Index - EP 0801585 B1

EP 0801585 B1 2000-05-24 - STICK

Title (en)

STICK

Title (de)

STOCK

Title (fr)

CROSSE

Publication

EP 0801585 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95943317 A

Priority

  • SE 9501536 W
  • SE 9500090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9621491A1] An indoor bandy stick comprises a shaft (1), a blade (2) with an outer, strip-shaped edge portion (4) which surrounds an inner portion of the blade, and an anchorage device for joining together the blade and the shaft. The anchorage device comprises an accommodation space for accommodating an end portion (14) of the shaft. The end portion (14) of the shaft (1) extends past the outer contour of the edge portion (4) of the blade (2) and into the inner portion of the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 59/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 59/70 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 59/70 (2015.10); A63B 2102/22 (2015.10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9621491 A1 19960718; AU 4460996 A 19960731; CZ 285756 B6 19991013; CZ 9702186 A3 19971217; DE 69517202 D1 20000629; DE 69517202 T2 20000928; EP 0801585 A1 19971022; EP 0801585 B1 20000524; NO 973209 A 19970821; NO 973209 D0 19970710; SE 503158 C2 19960401; SE 9500090 D0 19950112; SE 9500090 L 19951222

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517202 20000629

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990916

1999-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STICK

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970812

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK GB LI NL