Global Patent Index - EP 0801778 B1

EP 0801778 B1 2000-04-26 - ADHESIVE ENVELOPE

Title (en)

ADHESIVE ENVELOPE

Title (de)

ANHAFTENDE HÜLLE

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE ADHESIVE

Publication

EP 0801778 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96904916 A

Priority

  • FR 9600307 W
  • FR 9502539 A
  • FR 9502843 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627177A1] An adhesive envelope suitable for adhesion particularly to a package, and consisting of a pouch with a rear surface made from a sheet with an optionally adhesive front side, in which case it is protected by an adhesive backing in the form of a sheet or roll. An optionally transparent label with an adhesive back face is affixed to the front side of said rear surface after optionally depositing a document or a thin object thereon, so that said label contacts the rear surface by means of the adhesive. The adhesive properties of one adhesive area are neutralised by the presence of a portion of the protective release backing that covered the back face of the label before the backing was cut, whereby the combination of the adhesive label and the silicone-coated backing then forms a complex that is preferably provided in a strip. Such adhesive envelopes may advantageously be arranged on a rolled-up release backing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02; B31D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 75/54 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31D 1/021 (2013.01); B65D 75/545 (2013.01); G09F 3/0289 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627177 A1 19960906; DE 69607934 D1 20000531; DE 69607934 T2 20001005; DK 0801778 T3 20000807; EP 0801778 A1 19971022; EP 0801778 B1 20000426; ES 2145436 T3 20000701

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEYVAL JEAN-PIERRE

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060301

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-11-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050315

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-07-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145436 T3

2000-06-14 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 20000422 0100 ETECO S.A.R.L.

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607934 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980924

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970523

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE