Global Patent Index - EP 0801825 B1

EP 0801825 B1 2000-05-17 - CARBON BRUSH

Title (en)

CARBON BRUSH

Title (de)

KOHLEBÜRSTE

Title (fr)

BALAI EN CHARBON

Publication

EP 0801825 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900555 A

Priority

  • DE 19500016 A
  • EP 9600001 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19533031A1] A carbon brush (1) has a end-face surface, or contact surface (3) inclined to the lateral surface (4) of the commutator. The lower region of the inclined contact surface (3) is provided with one or more slots or groove (10, 11, 12) running in a transverse (tangential) direction. More specifically, the inclined contact surface (3) is curved in correspondence to the radius of the commutator (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/26 (2006.01); H02K 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19533031 A1 19960704; BR 9606965 A 19990126; CZ 287118 B6 20000913; CZ 9702088 A3 19971112; EP 0801825 A1 19971022; EP 0801825 B1 20000517; ES 2145423 T3 20000701; HU 9802169 A2 19981228; HU 9802169 A3 20020328; JP H10511838 A 19981110; US 5909077 A 19990601; WO 9621260 A1 19960711

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-04 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20021129

2003-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145423

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605249

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971016

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT