Global Patent Index - EP 0801974 B1

EP 0801974 B1 2000-08-09 - Device for homogenizing and/or dispersing a flowable material

Title (en)

Device for homogenizing and/or dispersing a flowable material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Homogenisieren und/oder Dispergieren eines fliessfähigen Guts

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'homogénéisation et/ou de dispersion d'un matériau apte à écoulement libre

Publication

EP 0801974 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106280 A

Priority

DE 29606962 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801974A1] The mixer for homogenising/dispersion liquids or pastes has a rotary mixer (4) at the base of the vessel. Material is driven by centrifugal action into the product chamber (10) from where it can recirculate to the vessel. A plate (15), concentric with a stator (7), which guides it, is notched at its circumference so that rotation opens, or closes, the recirculation passages (12). When passages (12) are closed the material is diverted to an external pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06; B01F 5/16; B01F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29606962 U1 19970821; EP 0801974 A1 19971022; EP 0801974 B1 20000809; ES 2148870 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: POSTFACH, 8058 ZUERICH-FLUGHAFEN (CH)

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EKATO SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59702120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-10-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DAUB, THOMAS, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DAUB, THOMAS, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-09-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DAUB, THOMAS, DIPL.-ING., DE

2014-09-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DAUB, THOMAS, DIPL.-ING., DE

2014-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI DAUB, CH

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EKATO SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148870

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990709

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980409

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI