Global Patent Index - EP 0801984 B1

EP 0801984 B1 2000-05-03 - Process and device for preparing cereals for grinding

Title (en)

Process and device for preparing cereals for grinding

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Mahlvorbereitung von Getreide

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la préparation de céréales en vue de leur mouture

Publication

EP 0801984 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111103 A

Priority

  • DE 4326836 A
  • EP 94922215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5650018A] PCT No. PCT/CH94/00160 Sec. 371 Date Jun. 14, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Jun. 14, 1995 PCT Filed Aug. 10, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/04595 PCT Pub. Date Feb. 16, 1995The new invention proposes a new method and an apparatus for the preparation of cereal for milling. Before conditioning, the grain is cleaned in a first dry stage and a second moist or wet stage, and the main quantity of water is added before or during the second stage, the grain for the moist or wet cleaning being in intermediate storage for 1 to 120 minutes. Preferably a continuously operating scouring machine is used for the dry cleaning as well as for the moist or wet cleaning, the grain being forcibly conveyed from the inlet to the outlet by conveying means and processed by areas of noses arranged alternately with the conveying means, and the material abraded by the scouring is repeatedly separated out with the rotational movement of the rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02B 3/00; B02B 1/00; B02B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02B 3/06 (2006.01); B02B 1/00 (2006.01); B02B 3/00 (2006.01); B02B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02B 1/08 (2013.01); B02B 1/00 (2013.01); B02B 3/00 (2013.01); B02B 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5650018 A 19970722; AT 177663 T 19990415; AT 192354 T 20000515; BR 9405550 A 19990908; CN 1065452 C 20010509; CN 1117273 A 19960221; CN 1178752 C 20041208; CN 1269264 A 20001011; CZ 289974 B6 20020515; CZ 9500908 A3 19951213; DE 4326836 A1 19950302; DE 4326836 C2 20020620; DE 4345422 C2 20020912; DK 0662864 T3 19990927; DK 0801984 T3 20000925; EP 0662864 A1 19950719; EP 0662864 B1 19990317; EP 0801984 A1 19971022; EP 0801984 B1 20000503; ES 2130437 T3 19990701; ES 2146440 T3 20000801; GR 3029941 T3 19990730; JP 3308539 B2 20020729; JP H08501984 A 19960305; KR 100275666 B1 20001215; PT 801984 E 20001031; RU 2076779 C1 19970410; RU 95109934 A 19960710; SK 282033 B6 20011008; SK 49095 A3 19951108; WO 9504595 A1 19950216

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130811

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130810

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130810

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409331

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130810

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090811

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100210

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUHLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-02-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100210

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080704

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080810

2009-03-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-07-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146440 T3

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409331 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 662864

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192354 T 20000515

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-12-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-08-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING CEREALS FOR GRINDING

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990310

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980223

1997-10-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 662864

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE