Global Patent Index - EP 0801985 B1

EP 0801985 B1 2001-05-30 - High pressure roller press for pressure milling of granular material

Title (en)

High pressure roller press for pressure milling of granular material

Title (de)

Hockdruck-Walzenpresse zur Druckzerkleinerung von körnigem Gutmaterial

Title (fr)

Presse à rouleaux à haute pression pour le broyage par pression de matériau granulé

Publication

EP 0801985 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104558 A

Priority

  • DE 19615479 A
  • DE 19630687 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801985A1] The mill incorporates two rolls driven in opposite directions and separated from one another by a roll gap. The rolls are surrounded by a housing consisting of stationary side plates (12, 13) with an interposed rotatable ring (16) serving for material circulation in the housing. Material entry takes place through one or more openings in one or both side plates and a material exit takes place through one or more openings in the side plates by use of a discharge unit (25) and/or through an exit connection (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 4/02; B02C 17/00; B02C 23/12; B02C 23/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/02 (2006.01); B02C 17/00 (2006.01); B02C 23/12 (2006.01); B02C 23/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/02 (2013.01); B02C 17/002 (2013.01); B02C 23/12 (2013.01); B02C 23/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801985 A1 19971022; EP 0801985 B1 20010530; DK 0801985 T3 20010806; US 5918823 A 19990706

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703637 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991222

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR