Global patent index - EP 0802018 B1

EP 0802018 B1 2000-07-19 - Apparatus for grinding an end-face, specially a ring-face, on the edge of a workpiece bore

Title (en)

Apparatus for grinding an end-face, specially a ring-face, on the edge of a workpiece bore

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schleifen einer Stirnfläche, insbesondere einer Ringfläche, am Rand einer Werkstück-Bohrung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la rectification d'une face d'extrémité, particulièrement d'une face frontale, au bord d'un alésage d'une pièce

Publication

EP 0802018 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106045 A

Priority

DE 29607203 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802018A1] The device has a grinding tool (1) which is cyclically oscillated at right angles to the longitudinal axis (2) of the grinding tool alignment pin (7). The pin is in line with the drive shaft (10,17) which rotates the grinding tool. An eccentric (9a) provides the periodic motion to the grinding tool. The eccentric is part of a quill drive (9) with an eccentric hole (24) in which a mount (22) for the grinding tool is supported so that it can move to-and-fro. The grinding tool can be set at an angle to the workpiece (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 15/02; B24B 33/02; B24B 33/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/00 (2006.01); B24B 15/02 (2006.01); B24B 33/02 (2006.01); B24B 33/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/055 (2013.01); B24B 15/02 (2013.01); B24B 33/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607203 U1 19970814; EP 0802018 A1 19971022; EP 0802018 B1 20000719; JP 3749777 B2 20060301; JP H1044010 A 19980217; US 6267653 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59702039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090412

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090412

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090412

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990326

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970911

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT