Global patent index - EP 0802029 A3

EP 0802029 A3 2000-06-28 - Method for orienting plural single crystal rods on a support in view of cutting up the rods simultaneously in a cutting machine and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for orienting plural single crystal rods on a support in view of cutting up the rods simultaneously in a cutting machine and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Orientieren von mehreren Einkristallbarren auf einem Träger für das gleichzeitige Aufschneiden der Barren in einer Schneidmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'orientation de plusieurs monocristaux posés côte à côte sur un support de découpage en vue d'une découpe simultanée dans une machine de découpage et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0802029 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 97103800 A

Priority

CH 95796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802029A2] The method involves preparing several monocrystals for cutting together in a single working cycle. The monocrystals are positioned successively using a guide (1) outside the machine tool in a predetermined orientation with respect to the cutting support to hold the crystals at a set angle with respect to the cutter. The cutting support is positioned in the cutter after fixing of the monocrystals and prior to the cutting step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 7/04; B28D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 21/00 (2006.01); B28D 5/00 (2006.01); B28D 5/04 (2006.01); C30B 33/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/301 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 5/0088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802029 A2 19971022; EP 0802029 A3 20000628; EP 0802029 B1 20030423; CH 691045 A5 20010412; DE 69721115 D1 20030528; DE 69721115 T2 20031224; JP H10100139 A 19980421; US 5839424 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120307

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69721115

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120307

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120307

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69721115

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020313

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28D 7/04 A, 7B 28D 5/00 B

1998-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HCT SHAPING SYSTEMS SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAUSER, CHARLES

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT