Global Patent Index - EP 0802056 B1

EP 0802056 B1 2002-11-20 - Liquid accommodating container, ink jet cartridge having said liquid accommodating container and ink jet apparatus having said ink jet cartridge

Title (en)

Liquid accommodating container, ink jet cartridge having said liquid accommodating container and ink jet apparatus having said ink jet cartridge

Title (de)

Behälter für Flüssigkeit, Tintenstrahlkassette mit diesem Behälter für Flüssigkeit und Tintenstrahlapparat mit dieser Tintenstrahlkassette

Title (fr)

Conteneur pour liquide, cartouche à jet d'encre comportant ledit conteneur et appareil à jet d'encre comportant ladite cartouche à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0802056 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97109851 A

Priority

  • EP 94109973 A
  • JP 15949493 A
  • JP 16179093 A
  • JP 16113593 A
  • JP 19137993 A
  • JP 21978793 A
  • JP 12596594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0631874A2] An ink jet cartridge comprises an ink jet head unit for discharging the ink, and an ink tank unit having an ink supply port for supplying the ink to the ink jet head unit. The ink tank unit has a partition portion for partitioning between an ink storing portion for storing the ink to be supplied to the ink jet head unit and a negative pressure generating member receiving portion having a negative pressure generating member. The ink supply port is provided on the negative pressure generating member receiving portion. And the partition portion has an ink communicating portion at an end portion of the partitioning portion on the side of the negative pressure generating member receiving portion where the ink supply port is provided, and makes contiguous the ink storing portion and the negative pressure generating member receiving portion in a movement direction of the ink tank unit when discharging the ink. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17556 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/17533 (2013.01); B41J 2/17536 (2013.01); B41J 2/17553 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0320165 A1 19890614 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0631874 A2 19950104; EP 0631874 A3 19950705; EP 0631874 B1 19990915; AT 184544 T 19991015; AT 217261 T 20020515; AT 226516 T 20021115; AT 226892 T 20021115; AT 228064 T 20021215; DE 69420624 D1 19991021; DE 69420624 T2 20000406; DE 69430589 D1 20020613; DE 69430589 T2 20021002; DE 69431605 D1 20021128; DE 69431605 T2 20030703; DE 69431634 D1 20021205; DE 69431634 T2 20030403; DE 69431762 D1 20030102; DE 69431762 T2 20030424; DK 0805032 T3 20021125; DK 0805033 T3 20020826; EP 0802056 A2 19971022; EP 0802056 A3 19971112; EP 0802056 B1 20021120; EP 0802057 A2 19971022; EP 0802057 A3 19971112; EP 0802057 B1 20021030; EP 0805032 A2 19971105; EP 0805032 A3 19971112; EP 0805032 B1 20021023; EP 0805033 A2 19971105; EP 0805033 A3 19971112; EP 0805033 B1 20020508; ES 2138013 T3 20000101; ES 2176559 T3 20021201; ES 2184924 T3 20030416; ES 2184925 T3 20030416; HK 1004639 A1 20021115; HK 1004640 A1 20030321; HK 1011663 A1 20000616; PT 805032 E 20030228; PT 805033 E 20021031; SG 67330 A1 19990921; SG 87851 A1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130629

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69431762

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120611

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Free text: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA#30-2, 3-CHOME, SHIMOMARUKO, OHTA-KU#TOKYO (JP) -TRANSFER TO- CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA#30-2, 3-CHOME, SHIMOMARUKO, OHTA-KU#TOKYO (JP)

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184925 T3

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431762 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 631874

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228064 T 20021215

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991008

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980330

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1997-10-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 631874

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE