Global Patent Index - EP 0802098 B1

EP 0802098 B1 2002-11-27 - Variable screw-driven system

Title (en)

Variable screw-driven system

Title (de)

Gewindeantrieb mit variabler Übersetzung

Title (fr)

Système de transmission à vis à pas variable

Publication

EP 0802098 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200860 A

Priority

US 63218996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5667283A] A variable screw-driven system includes a rotatable drive screw powered by a motor actuator. A nut is disposed about the drive screw and is linearly translatable in response to rotation of the drive screw. The nut carries a cam follower which travels within a cam track. Linear translation of the nut is altered by tracking of the cam following within the cam track such that rotation of the nut is effected simultaneously with rotation of the drive screw resulting in an effective variable pitch of the variable screw-driven system wherein linear translation of the nut results from both rotation of the drive screw and rotation of the nut.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/00; B60T 8/42; B60T 13/66; F16H 25/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/00 (2006.01); B60T 8/32 (2006.01); B60T 8/42 (2006.01); B60T 8/48 (2006.01); B60T 13/74 (2006.01); F16H 25/20 (2006.01); F16H 37/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/4863 (2013.01); B60T 8/00 (2013.01); B60T 8/4266 (2013.01); B60T 13/745 (2013.01); F16H 25/186 (2013.01); F16H 25/20 (2013.01); F16H 37/124 (2013.01); F16H 2025/2081 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2101 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5667283 A 19970916; DE 69717340 D1 20030109; DE 69717340 T2 20030424; EP 0802098 A2 19971022; EP 0802098 A3 19981021; EP 0802098 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717340

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2005-03-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717340 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB