Global Patent Index - EP 0802152 B1

EP 0802152 B1 2003-06-11 - Cable guide for a winch

Title (en)

Cable guide for a winch

Title (de)

Seilführung für ein Windwerk

Title (fr)

Guidage de câble pour un treuil

Publication

EP 0802152 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97250121 A

Priority

DE 19617098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802152A2] The guide is part of a hoist winch which has a drum with rope grooves of opposite pitch, while guide members for a pair of rope falls are coupled together and travel in opposite directions along a rail parallel to the axis of rotation of the drum, being driven by the falls as the latter wind on or off the drum. The members (3a,b) are coupled together by lengthwise beams (7a,b) guided in parallel tracks (2a,b). Each beam is supported at two or more points spaced apart, and has one of the members rigidly fixed to it. Each beam can consist of a rack, with which a pinion turning freely in the rail (1) meshes, and can be supported in its guide by horizontal travel wheels (10a,b) turning freely at its ends. It can also have a vertical supporting roller (11a,b) turning freely at its end furthest from the guide member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802152 A2 19971022; EP 0802152 A3 19981209; EP 0802152 B1 20030611; DE 19617098 C1 19971127; JP H1036083 A 19980210; US 5829737 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710247

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710247

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710247 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010925

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990527

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT