Global Patent Index - EP 0802287 B1

EP 0802287 B1 2002-09-04 - Height adjustable drainage grating

Title (en)

Height adjustable drainage grating

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbarer Drainagerost

Title (fr)

Grille de drainage réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0802287 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104958 A

Priority

DE 29607127 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802287A2] The grating is provided with two slide-on slide parts (28;628) on two profile sections (22,4) of two support profiles (14,16) which have a lateral bar (26) and two seats (30,32) on opposite ends of the bar for one of the profile sections of both support profiles. two tapped receivers (40) are provided on the lateral bar for two threaded shafts (36) of a foot. Both seats are clamped in the inserted profile section. The support profiles have a T-shaped cross section, and the seats are located on the lateral bar in such a way that in the specified assembly position, a vertically downward pointing profile section of the support profile is insertable from above in the seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0445 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607127 U1 19970821; AT 223543 T 20020915; EP 0802287 A2 19971022; EP 0802287 A3 19980819; EP 0802287 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 223543 T

- Effective date: 20170324

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-03-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708098

2017-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 223543 T

- Effective date: 20170202

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-24 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: WALTER GUTJAHR

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-09-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUTJAHR, WALTER, 64404 BICKENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59708098

2015-09-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708098

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KATSCHER HABERMANN, DE

2015-08-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUTJAHR, WALTER, DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GUTJAHR, WALTER

- Free text: GUTJAHR, WALTER#ERNST-LUDWIG-WEG 29#64404 BICKENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GUTJAHR, WALTER#ERNST-LUDWIG-WEG 29#64404 BICKENBACH (DE)

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GUTJAHR WALTER

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030312

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708098 20021010

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223543 T 20020915

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010921

1999-11-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: GUTJAHR, WALTER

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUTJAHR, WALTER

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE