Global patent index - EP 0802380 B1

EP 0802380 B1 2001-01-31 - Refrigerant condenser with a built-in receiver

Title (en)

Refrigerant condenser with a built-in receiver

Title (de)

Kältemittelverflüssiger mit Einbausammler

Title (fr)

Condenseur de réfrigérant à réservoir intégré

Publication

EP 0802380 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302587 A

Priority

JP 12109096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802380A1] In a condenser (1), an outlet header pipe and a receiver are formed in a single body as a receiver-integral type outlet header pipe (7) including a outlet header pipe portion (3) and a receiver (13) integrally formed in fluid communication. The outlet header pipe portion (3) is inserted with a plurality of heat exchange tubes (4) at a side thereof in a tube inserting direction and connected to the heat exchange tubes (4), and includes a partition plate inserted thereinto at the opposite side in a partition inserting direction (A). The receiver portion (13) extends from the outlet header pipe portion (3) in a direction (B) perpendicular to the partition inserting direction (A). The receiver portion (13) and the outlet header pipe portion (3) are serially arranged in a direction (C) of the air flow to be heat exchanged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/04; F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F28F 9/0212 (2013.01); F28F 9/0214 (2013.01); F25B 2339/044 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802380 A1 19971022; EP 0802380 B1 20010131; DE 69703998 D1 20010308; DE 69703998 T2 20010613; JP H09280773 A 19971031

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703998

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703998

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120416

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120416

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120416

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110413

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-04-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030417

2002-04-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020405

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703998

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-08

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991021

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980409

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE