Global Patent Index - EP 0802390 B1

EP 0802390 B1 2000-10-18 - Method for identifying a corrected desintegration time of a programmable and frangible projectile

Title (en)

Method for identifying a corrected desintegration time of a programmable and frangible projectile

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung einer korrigierten Zerlegungszeit eines programmierbar zerlegbaren Geschosses

Title (fr)

Procédé de détermination d'un temps de désintégration corrigé d'un projectile programmable et frangible

Publication

EP 0802390 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118039 A

Priority

CH 100096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802390A1] The disaggregation time determination involves performing a calculation based upon an impact distance (RT) to a target determined from sensor data, a projectile velocity (Vm) measured at a muzzle of a gun barrel and a given disaggregation distance (Dz). The disaggregation distance is kept constant by correction of a disaggregation time (Tz). The correction is performed using the equation: Tz(Vm) = Tz + K*(Vm-Vov) Vov is a lead velocity of the projectile. K is a correction factor. The disaggregation distance is a distance between an impact point and a disaggregation point of the projectile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/00 (2006.01); F42C 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802390 A1 19971022; EP 0802390 B1 20001018; AT 197090 T 20001115; AU 716344 B2 20000224; AU 7172896 A 19971023; CA 2190386 A1 19971020; CA 2190386 C 20030916; DE 59606025 D1 20001123; JP 4008520 B2 20071114; JP H09280798 A 19971031; NO 312143 B1 20020325; NO 964756 A 19971020; NO 964756 D0 19961108; SG 83657 A1 20011016; TR 9600939 A1 19971121; US 5814755 A 19980929; ZA 9609543 B 19970617

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151111

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606025

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121111

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121111

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121111

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197090 T

- Effective date: 20121111

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OERLIKON CONTRAVES A.G.

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL AIR DEFENCE AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON-CONTRAVES AG, ZUERICH, CH

- Document: DE 59606025

- Effective date: 20120523

2012-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606025

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120523

2012-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606025

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606025

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111110

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-02-16 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59606025

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-12-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606025

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2011-10-19 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59606025

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2000-12-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606025 20001123

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197090 T 20001115

2000-06-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A CORRECTED DESINTEGRATION TIME OF A PROGRAMMABLE AND FRANGIBLE PROJECTILE

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG

1999-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE DESINTEGRATION TIME OF A PROGRAMMABLE AND FRANGIBLE PROJECTILE

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990526

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971211

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE