Global Patent Index - EP 0802451 B1

EP 0802451 B1 2000-07-26 - Silver halide photographic material and method for processing the same

Title (en)

Silver halide photographic material and method for processing the same

Title (de)

Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Verfahren zu dessen Verarbeitung

Title (fr)

Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent et méthode pour son traitement

Publication

EP 0802451 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97106377 A

Priority

JP 9695096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802451A1] A silver halide photographic light-sensitive material comprising a support having thereon at least one light-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer and at least one protective layer provided on the emulsion layer, wherein: the silver halide emulsion comprises a silver halide emulsion chemically sensitized with either or both of a selenium compound and a tellurium compound; at least one of the silver halide emulsion layer and other hydrophilic colloid layer(s) contains at least one hydrazine derivative; and the outermost layer of the protective layer(s) contains one or more kinds of alkylpolysiloxane. Also disclosed is a method for processing the silver halide photographic light-sensitive material with a developing solution having a pH of less than 11.0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/76; G03C 1/06; G03C 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/29 (2006.01); G03C 1/04 (2006.01); G03C 1/06 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 1/295 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/061 (2013.01); G03C 1/04 (2013.01); G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 1/09 (2013.01); G03C 2001/097 (2013.01); G03C 2001/098 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7488 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802451 A1 19971022; EP 0802451 B1 20000726; DE 69702634 D1 20000831; DE 69702634 T2 20001109; JP H09281627 A 19971031

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702634

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-12-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702634 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980206

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB