Global Patent Index - EP 0802490 A9

EP 0802490 A9 2003-06-25 - System and method for connecting portable media with a network

Title (en)

System and method for connecting portable media with a network

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zum Anschliessen eines portablen Mediums an ein Netzwerk

Title (fr)

Système et méthode pour connecter des supports portables à un réseau

Publication

EP 0802490 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 97106401 A

Priority

JP 9824296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802490A2] The present invention aims to execute customization for each user in case portable media for computer published in large quantity are used in combination with a network. The information to control corresponding relation between portable media and users is substituted by media-identifying information 101 different for each medium among media-related information 100 set to the portable media in advance, and this is used for the control of the users. Thus, there is no need to register the users, and customization for each user can be improved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/02 (2012.01); G06Q 30/06 (2012.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 50/10 (2012.01); G06Q 50/20 (2012.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/0621 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802490 A2 19971022; EP 0802490 A3 20030319; EP 0802490 A9 20030625; AU 1897097 A 19971106; AU 698528 B2 19981029; CN 1104798 C 20030402; CN 1167944 A 19971217; JP 2006172447 A 20060629; JP 3814370 B2 20060830; JP 3995014 B2 20071024; JP H1069511 A 19980310; KR 100261200 B1 20000701; US 5937158 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080712

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/30 A, 7G 06F 19/00 B

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970417

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB