Global patent index - EP 0802509 A3

EP 0802509 A3 2000-01-26 - Automatic road use charging method

Title (en)

Automatic road use charging method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur automatischen Erhebung von Strassenbenutzungsgebühren

Title (fr)

Procédé de taxation automatique de péage routier

Publication

EP 0802509 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97100575 A

Priority

DE 19615733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802509A2] The method employs vehicle-borne equipment (1), a roadside beacon (2) and a satellite (3). In the vehicle a microwave transponder (4) is connected to a chip card (6) and a GPS radio-navigation module (7) which receives the satellite signal (S). The transponder transmits a flow of data (D1) including tariff-relevant parameters and positions to the beacon, from which it receives in return the amount of the toll (D2). When this has been debited the transponder sends a guarantee (Z) to the beacon, which responds with an acknowledgment (Q) to the chip card.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/06 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802509 A2 19971022; EP 0802509 A3 20000126; EP 0802509 B1 20030507; AT 239952 T 20030515; DE 19615733 A1 19971023

INPADOC legal status

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 239952

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59710013

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140116

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140116

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59710013

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030612

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011116

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI SE

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI SE