Global Patent Index - EP 0802551 B1

EP 0802551 B1 2001-12-05 - Locking device for cartridge fuses in an isolating switch

Title (en)

Locking device for cartridge fuses in an isolating switch

Title (de)

Verriegelungseinrichtung für Sicherungseinsätze in einem Trennschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour cartouches à fusibles dans un sectionneur

Publication

EP 0802551 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102389 A

Priority

DE 19615444 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802551A2] The device has securing fittings arranged transversely adjacent, separated from each other by at least one phase isolation wall and held by suspension parts via grip lugs. Each has a sprung latch (15) which can be locked with the lug (2). At least two latches (15) are mounted on a common slider which can be moved transversely to the longitudinal direction (11) of the securing device mounted in the isolating switch against the bias force of a spring. This brings the latches out of engagement with the lugs. The latches extend through a cover side wall to form a pushbutton (21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 31/12; H01H 85/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 31/12 (2006.01); H01H 85/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/0208 (2013.01); H01H 31/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802551 A2 19971022; EP 0802551 A3 19980128; EP 0802551 B1 20011205; AT 210335 T 20011215; DE 19615444 A1 19971023; PL 182231 B1 20011130; PL 319530 A1 19971027

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210335 T

- Effective date: 20170214

2017-02-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705613

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-02-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705613 20020117

2002-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EFEN GMBH

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970225

2001-12-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210335 T 20011215

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000201

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980218

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1998-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970225

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1997-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970225