Global Patent Index - EP 0802559 B1

EP 0802559 B1 2001-12-05 - Flat panel display with hydrogen source

Title (en)

Flat panel display with hydrogen source

Title (de)

Flacher Bildschirm mit Wasserstoffquelle

Title (fr)

Ecran plat de visualisation à source d'hydrogène

Publication

EP 0802559 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97410044 A

Priority

FR 9605121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802559A1] The screen has a cathode composed of microdots (2) for electron bombardment of an anode (5) provided with luminophores (7) of the primary colours. The source of progressive emission is a resistive coating (11) of hydrogenated silicon or its carbide, nitride or oxide, or hydrogenated carbon or germanium. An alternative source comprises a number of insulating strips or tracks (8) which separate the luminophores on the anode side of the evacuated space (12). Either source may be formed by plasma-enhanced chemical vapour deposition with controlled temperature, pressure or self-bias voltage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12; H01J 29/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 31/12 (2006.01); H01J 9/39 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01); H01J 29/88 (2006.01); H01J 29/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/88 (2013.01); H01J 29/94 (2013.01); H01J 2201/30403 (2013.01); H01J 2329/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802559 A1 19971022; EP 0802559 B1 20011205; DE 69708739 D1 20020117; DE 69708739 T2 20020718; FR 2747839 A1 19971024; FR 2747839 B1 19980703; JP H1055770 A 19980224; US 5907215 A 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-26 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20051202

2006-04-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20051202

2005-04-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-02 [29U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20020906

2005-03-02 [29W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS AFTER GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20050502

2003-04-23 [29U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-11-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CANON INC.

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708739 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010205

1998-12-09 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980406

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT