Global Patent Index - EP 0802561 B1

EP 0802561 B1 2000-07-19 - Halogen lamp

Title (en)

Halogen lamp

Title (de)

Halogenlampe

Title (fr)

Lampe halogène

Publication

EP 0802561 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105626 A

Priority

  • DE 29607132 U
  • DE 29620098 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802561A1] The 75 W lamp for general lighting purposes has a cylindrical quartz glass bulb (2) in a bayonet fitting (16). The U-shaped filament (6) is manufactured of tungsten with two coils (8) in a supporting wire frame (9). The coils are terminated with uncoiled sections (19) about 4 mm long fused into a pinch (5) and welded to molybdenum foil seals (20). These sections are manufactured of wire having a maximum diameter of preferably 80 mu m, and spaced in relation to the applied voltage so that in the event of arcing, the effective field strength is preferably between 200 and 400 V/cm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/40; H01K 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/50 (2006.01); H01K 1/40 (2006.01); H01K 1/46 (2006.01); H01K 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/66 (2013.01); H01J 5/60 (2013.01); H01K 1/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802561 A1 19971022; EP 0802561 B1 20000719; CN 1083146 C 20020417; CN 1188562 A 19980722; EP 0839381 A1 19980506; EP 0839381 B1 20010704; ES 2160351 T3 20011101; HU 218813 B 20001228; HU 220535 B1 20020328; HU 9700773 A2 19971229; HU 9700773 A3 20000228; HU 9700773 D0 19970630; HU 9901460 A2 19990830; HU 9901460 A3 20010528; JP 4054086 B2 20080227; JP H1040879 A 19980213; JP H11508402 A 19990721; KR 100455460 B1 20041217; US 5883469 A 19990316; US 6060820 A 20000509; WO 9740511 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702042

2017-03-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 80807 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702042

- Effective date: 20111130

2005-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040404

2003-04-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030410

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030410

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-10-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702042 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990901

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971105

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL