Global Patent Index - EP 0802587 A3

EP 0802587 A3 2000-01-19 - Mounting structure with lamp base for two pin fluorescent tube or similar

Title (en)

Mounting structure with lamp base for two pin fluorescent tube or similar

Title (de)

Montagekasten mit einer Lampen-fassung für Zweistift-Leucht-stofflampen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Boîtier de montage avec socle de lampe pour lampe fluorescente à deux broches ou similaire

Publication

EP 0802587 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97105743 A

Priority

DE 19615372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0802587A2] A lamp holder has a pot-shaped mounting/installation housing (1) with attachments for a plug-in mounting box. Lamp holder contact elements (19) are fed via parts of the mounting housing and/or parts connected to it to the opening edge of the mounting housing. Connectors (25,26) for electrical cables are mounted in the vicinity of the opening edge. The connecting devices contain the contact devices (20) for the contact elements (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/08 (2006.01); H01R 13/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/08 (2013.01); F21V 19/008 (2013.01); H01R 13/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0802587 A2 19971022; EP 0802587 A3 20000119; EP 0802587 B1 20011107; AT 208539 T 20011115; DE 19615372 A1 19971023; DE 19615372 C2 19980716; ES 2163057 T3 20020116

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050409

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-04-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163057 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705236 20011213

2001-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208539 T 20011115

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 33/08 A, 7F 21V 19/00 B, 7H 01R 13/74 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL