Global Patent Index - EP 0802826 B1

EP 0802826 B1 2000-12-06 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING COMPONENTS FROM LIQUID HOMOGENOUS OR HETEROGENEOUS SYSTEMS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING COMPONENTS FROM LIQUID HOMOGENOUS OR HETEROGENEOUS SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTRENNEN VON KOMPONENTEN AUS FLÜSSIGEN HOMOGENEN ODER HETEROGENEN SYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SEPARER DES COMPOSANTS DE SYSTEMES HOMOGENES OU HETEROGENES LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 0802826 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95915125 A

Priority

  • DE 9500453 W
  • DE 4411823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4411823A1] The invention relates to a process and a device for separating components, especially species which are dissolved molecularly, ionogenously or colloidally or are micro-organisms, from liquid homogenous or heterogeneous systems. According to the process, a liquid homogenous or heterogeneous system is conveyed through a container with fillers polarisable in solutions and then the components separated from the liquid homogenous or heterogeneous system are removed preferably with the aid of a regenerating solution, an electric field being applied in at least one of the steps of the process. In the process of the invention, polarisable substances in combination with an electric field ensure a high cleaning effect and universal applicability, and make it possible quickly to regenerate the technical facilities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 5/02 (2006.01); C02F 1/28 (2006.01); C02F 1/463 (2006.01); C02F 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 5/024 (2013.01); C02F 1/28 (2013.01); C02F 1/463 (2013.01); C02F 1/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4411823 A1 19951012; AT 197914 T 20001215; AU 2213095 A 19951023; DE 19580260 D2 19970522; EP 0802826 A1 19971029; EP 0802826 B1 20001206; ES 2153478 T3 20010301; GR 3035465 T3 20010531; PT 802826 E 20010430; WO 9526829 A1 19951012

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030329

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ANDREYEV VITALIJ *SERGEJEWITSCH

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-03-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-04-01 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020401

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010911

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153478 T3

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197914 T 20001215

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDREYEV, VITALIJ SERGEJEWITSCH, DR.

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990125

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDREYEV, VITALIJ SERGEJEWITSCH, DR.

1998-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANZ, HEIKO

1998-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDREYEV, VITALIJ SERGEJEWITSCH, DR.

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970117

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE