Global Patent Index - EP 0802846 B1

EP 0802846 B1 2002-11-20 - MOVABLE BLADE SHAVING CARTRIDGE OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

MOVABLE BLADE SHAVING CARTRIDGE OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

RASIERKLINGENEINHEIT MIT BEWEGLICHEN KLINGEN ODER ÄHNLICHE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

TETE DE RASOIR A LAMES MOBILES OU ANALOGUE

Publication

EP 0802846 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94922531 A

Priority

US 9407802 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9602370A1] A movable blade cartridge (10) including a platform member (2) having a blade seat (24) and a guard member (20). The guard member (20) is located forward of the parallel to the blade seat (24) so as to form a longitudinal slot (26) between the blade seat and the guard member. A primary blade (32) is disposed on the blade seat (24) such that the cutting edge of the blade is located rearwardly of the guard member. A substantial portion of the primary blade (32) extends into the slot formed between the guard member and the blade seat such that the blade is flexible into the slot. A spacer (6) is located on the upper surface of the primary blade. The spacer comprises a rear portion as well as a forward portion which extends from the rear portion and functions to prevent upward movement of the primary blade (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/22; B26B 21/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/22 (2006.01); B26B 21/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/4018 (2013.01); B26B 21/227 (2013.01); B26B 21/4012 (2013.01); B26B 21/4031 (2013.01); B26B 21/4068 (2013.01); B26B 21/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9602370 A1 19960201; DE 69431763 D1 20030102; EP 0802846 A1 19971029; EP 0802846 A4 19980902; EP 0802846 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110714

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110714

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431763 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990514

1998-09-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980715

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970214

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB