Global Patent Index - EP 0802965 B1

EP 0802965 B1 2000-04-12 - SPRAY-DRIED WASHING AGENT OR COMPONENT THEREFOR

Title (en)

SPRAY-DRIED WASHING AGENT OR COMPONENT THEREFOR

Title (de)

SPRÜHGETROCKNETES WASCHMITTEL ODER KOMPONENTE HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

DETERGENT SECHE PAR PULVERISATION OU CONSTITUANT POUR CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 0802965 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95942725 A

Priority

  • DE 19500644 A
  • EP 9505092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19500644A1] A spray-dried washing agent or a component therefor containing anionic tensides, inorganic builders and other washing agent components is to be prepared which is easily rinsable and solvent. This is attained by a spray-dried grain which contains a) 3 to 20 wt.% anionic tensides, b) 0 to 2 wt.% non-ionic tensides, c) 20 to 65 wt.% inorganic builders (related to the anhydrous active agent) from the group of carbonates, hydrogen carbonates and silicate builders, d) 0 to 25 wt.% neutral salts, e) other normal components, with the proviso that the spray-dried grain is then post-treated with non-ionic tensides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 11/0088 (2013.01); C11D 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19500644 A1 19960718; DE 19500644 B4 20100909; AT 191742 T 20000415; DE 59508178 D1 20000518; EP 0802965 A1 19971029; EP 0802965 B1 20000412; ES 2146796 T3 20000816; JP 3841431 B2 20061101; JP H10512007 A 19981117; US 5948747 A 19990907; WO 9621713 A1 19960718

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-06-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-06-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20040315

2004-02-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040102

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2002-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

2002-10-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY * 20010110 UNILEVER P

- Effective date: 20010108

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146796 T3

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508178 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191742 T 20000415

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL