Global Patent Index - EP 0803162 A4

EP 0803162 A4 2000-09-13 - SYNCHRONIZING A PACKETIZED DIGITAL DATASTREAM TO AN OUTPUT PROCESSOR IN A TELEVISION SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM

Title (en)

SYNCHRONIZING A PACKETIZED DIGITAL DATASTREAM TO AN OUTPUT PROCESSOR IN A TELEVISION SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYNCHRONISATION EINES DIGITALEN DATENSTROMPACKETS ZU EINEM AUSGANGSPROZESSOR IN EINEM FERNSEHSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYNCHRONISATION D'UN FLUX DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES EN PAQUETS ALIMENTANT UN PROCESSEUR DE SORTIE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX DE TELEVISION

Publication

EP 0803162 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94919502 A

Priority

US 9406803 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9534990A1] In a system for processing a packetized digital datastream representing MPEG coded image information, an encoder includes a transport encoder (20) for forming data packets, and an output processor (40, 48) for performing various signal processing functions such as error correction processing and modulation, for example. During acquisition intervals, the output processor requests/acquires data packets from the transport encoder for processing. The system also includes apparatus (25, 30) to assure that a reference (sync) byte at the beginning of a data packet is automatically aligned with the beginning of the acquisition interval, even when arbitrary system resets occur. In an illustrated embodiment, alignment of the first data packet following a system reset is facilitated by the coaction of a Start Of Packet (SOP) flag concurrent with the reference byte, and a logic network (32, 36, 38) which controls data passage in response to the flag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/24; H04N 7/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04L 25/05 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01); H04N 7/50 (2006.01); H04N 7/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/242 (2013.01); H04L 25/05 (2013.01); H04N 7/56 (2013.01); H04N 19/00 (2013.01); H04N 19/61 (2014.11); H04N 21/236 (2013.01); H04N 21/2383 (2013.01); H04N 19/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9601024 A1 19960111 - THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR], et al
  • [Y] US 5287178 A 19940215 - ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al
  • [Y] US 4583238 A 19860415 - BOISSEAU ALAIN [FR], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 271 (E - 1218) 18 June 1992 (1992-06-18)
  • [A] NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BROADCASTERS (NAB): "TRANSPORT SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL BROADCAST ENGINEERING CONFERENCE,US,----, NAB, vol. CONF. 48, 1994, pages 1 - 17,27-36, XP000674109
  • See also references of WO 9534990A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9534990 A1 19951221; AU 7061894 A 19960105; EP 0803162 A1 19971029; EP 0803162 A4 20000913; JP H10501941 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2000-09-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 7/24 A, 7H 04N 7/62 B

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961211

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB