Global Patent Index - EP 0803213 A3

EP 0803213 A3 2000-11-08 - Refrigerated display counter

Title (en)

Refrigerated display counter

Title (de)

Warenkühltheke

Title (fr)

Comptoir frigorifique

Publication

EP 0803213 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97106774 A

Priority

  • DE 19616357 A
  • US 16889898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803213A2] The display cabinet has a display surface (2) around which a refrigerated air stream (7) is circulated, with a filter (19) in the air circulation path for removing suspended dust particles or bacteria. The filter fits across the cross-section of an air outlet (20a) of a flow channel (20) for the refrigerated air stream at the rear of the display surface and is removable for cleaning, the necessity for cleaning indicated by a pressure sensor, or an acidity sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0413 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0016402 A2 19801001 - LINDE AG [DE]
  • [A] GB 2251928 A 19920722 - IMI CORNELIUS [GB]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 663 (M - 1723) 14 December 1994 (1994-12-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 05 30 June 1995 (1995-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0803213 A2 19971029; EP 0803213 A3 20001108; EP 0803213 B1 20030212; DE 19616357 A1 19971106; DE 59709295 D1 20030320; ES 2192631 T3 20031016; US 6182459 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2016-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150424

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150424

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-01-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150424

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59709295

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140416

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59709295

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2012-05-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59709295

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192631 T3

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709295 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-06-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-05-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-03-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL