Global patent index - EP 0803330 B1

EP 0803330 B1 2000-07-19 - Profiled clamping jaw

Title (en)

Profiled clamping jaw

Title (de)

Formspannbacken

Title (fr)

Machoire profilée de serrage

Publication

EP 0803330 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103224 A

Priority

DE 19615634 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803330A1] The jaw is for work of any external shape, having a body (2) containing independently-sliding tappets (4) together forming the clamping face. The tappets work in cylinders (3) and are thrust by hydraulic pressure in the clamping direction, being locked by shutting off the cylinders. A thrust plate (13) is spring-mounted (14) on the body, and has at its side furthest from the latter a membrane (15). Hydraulic pressure applied to the latter moves the plate in opposition to the springs, thus shutting off the tappet cylinders. All the latter can be shut off by a single plate, which can have a sealant such as paste on its side towards the body. The plate can be contained in a pocket (11) in the body, and the membrane can be secured to the latter using a cover (16) held by screws (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/2421 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19615634 C1 19970925; AT 194789 T 20000815; EP 0803330 A1 19971029; EP 0803330 B1 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702043

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: S + B TECHNOLOGIE SCHAETZLE + BERGMANN GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-07-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194789

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAETZLE HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980930

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980131

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE