Global Patent Index - EP 0803426 B1

EP 0803426 B1 2000-03-15 - Running gear, especially bogie

Title (en)

Running gear, especially bogie

Title (de)

Fahrwerk, insbesondere Drehgestell

Title (fr)

Train de roulement, notamment bogie

Publication

EP 0803426 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106712 A

Priority

EP 96106712 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803426A1] The running axles (6) or shafts are connected by radially disposed link rods (4) and by connecting rods (3) which preferably are parallel to the track. Horizontal forces corresponding to the extension of the link rods and connecting rods are initiated damped or undamped in the pivot points. The vertical support of the running wheels in relation to the wagon body (9) is effected through the running axle or shaft, or connecting rods or link rods via spring elements which are preferably pneumatic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/38; B61F 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/16 (2006.01); B61F 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/38 (2013.01); B61F 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0803426 A1 19971029; EP 0803426 B1 20000315; AT 190574 T 20000415; DE 59604686 D1 20000420; ES 2145950 T3 20000716

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-08-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 190574 T

- Effective date: 20160427

2016-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150414

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150310

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2001-01-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2000-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: LEITNER INTERNATIONAL B.V. TRANSFER- HIGH TECHNOLOGY INVESTMENTS B.V.

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145950 T3

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604686 20000420

2000-04-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LEITNER INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190574 T 20000415

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEITNER AUSTRIA GMBH

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981210

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970909

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI