Global Patent Index - EP 0803457 B1

EP 0803457 B1 2000-01-19 - Device for separating and lifting the uppermost sheet of a sheet stack

Title (en)

Device for separating and lifting the uppermost sheet of a sheet stack

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trennen und Anheben des obersten Bogens von einem Bogenstapel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer et soulever la feuille de dessus d'une pile de feuilles

Publication

EP 0803457 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106151 A

Priority

DE 19616333 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803457A2] A carrier (1) is positioned on the sheet stack (2) in the upper rear face area, and on the carrier the stripping element is guided to move between its at-rest position and its swung-out position, and in its at-rest position is spring-loaded. The carrier is spring-loaded against the rear side of the stack, and is in the form of a lever which by one end can swivel over the rear end area of the stack around an axis orientated at right angles to the sheet feed direction, and by its free other end is positioned on the stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/56; B65H 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0803457 A2 19971029; EP 0803457 A3 19980401; EP 0803457 B1 20000119; DE 19616333 A1 19971106; DE 19616333 C2 20010712; JP 2891958 B2 19990517; JP H1035929 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040415

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010421

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701024 20000224

2000-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990108

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970506

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI