Global Patent Index - EP 0803595 B1

EP 0803595 B1 2002-11-20 - Fiber bundle threading device

Title (en)

Fiber bundle threading device

Title (de)

Einfädelvorrichtung für Faserbündel

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enfilage pour faisceau de fibres

Publication

EP 0803595 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97105398 A

Priority

JP 10566996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803595A2] A device automating the threading of fiber bundle provided with a travelling car 3 that runs along the direction in which the feed rollers 2 are arranged, and an operating arm 4 that is arranged on the travelling car 3, operates in conjunction with that running and suitably threads tow on the feed rollers 2. The operating arm 4 is provided with a vertical swing system 5 for movement in the vertical direction and a lateral swing system 6 for movement in the horizontal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/00; D01D 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/08 (2006.01); B65H 51/28 (2006.01); D01H 5/00 (2006.01); D01H 9/04 (2006.01); D01H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/00 (2013.01); D01H 13/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0803595 A2 19971029; EP 0803595 A3 19980708; EP 0803595 B1 20021120; DE 69717187 D1 20030102; DE 69717187 T2 20030821; JP 2867953 B2 19990310; JP H09290959 A 19971111

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2004-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717187 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980910

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT