Global Patent Index - EP 0803653 B1

EP 0803653 B1 2000-08-02 - Pneumatic commandassembly

Title (en)

Pneumatic commandassembly

Title (de)

Pneumatische Betätigungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Système pneumatique de commande

Publication

EP 0803653 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97890068 A

Priority

  • AT 76296 A
  • US 84801597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803653A1] The operating device has a number of pneumatic loads (1), e.g. operating cylinders, with their pressure spaces (7,8) coupled via pressure lines to electrically operated switching devices, coupled to a common pressure source and to a common electrical control (19). A combined signal line and pressure supply line (12) extends between a load control device (9) for each load and an air/electrical signal distributor (13) coupled to the pressure source and the electrical control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00; F15B 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01); F15B 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/0817 (2013.01); F15B 13/0828 (2013.01); F15B 13/0867 (2013.01); F15B 13/0875 (2013.01); F15B 15/202 (2013.01); F15B 15/2807 (2013.01); F15B 21/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0803653 A1 19971029; EP 0803653 B1 20000802; CA 2203580 A1 19971026; CZ 286765 B6 20000614; CZ 9701270 A3 19971112; JP H1054404 A 19980224; PL 183208 B1 20020628; PL 319593 A1 19971027; US 5823088 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-27 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2003-04-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021123

2003-04-16 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20021123

2002-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020424

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FESTO AG & CO

2001-06-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FESTO AG & CO

- Effective date: 20010421

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702097 20000907

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991007

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980202

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE