Global Patent Index - EP 0804043 A3

EP 0804043 A3 2000-03-08 - Protective cover for modules in telecommunication technology

Title (en)

Protective cover for modules in telecommunication technology

Title (de)

Schutzhaube für Module der Telekommikationstechnik

Title (fr)

Capot de protection pour modules dans la technique des télécommunications

Publication

EP 0804043 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96119547 A

Priority

DE 29607356 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0804043A2] The cover (30) is fitted over one or more modules (10) retained by catches (12) in a trough (18), with a seal (40) which covers the module(s) and/or the cables (20) leading to the electrical contacts. The edge (38) of the cover is fitted closely to the outer rim of the seal. The cover is a hollow square open to one side with an upper section (32) and four sidewalls (34) enclosing a cavity (36) which accommodates the contacts. Cables are introduced through guides (16) and run along the longer sides of the module(s).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 1/14; H01R 13/52; H05K 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 5/03 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H02G 15/117 (2006.01); H04Q 1/02 (2006.01); H04Q 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 1/142 (2013.01); H01R 13/5213 (2013.01); H02G 15/117 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB GR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607356 U1 19970828; BR 9700821 A 19980707; EP 0804043 A2 19971029; EP 0804043 A3 20000308; EP 0804043 B1 20050720; PL 180904 B1 20010430; PL 317630 A1 19971027; RU 2161383 C2 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2006-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-09-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-02-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-10-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59611248

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR LI SE

2005-07-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

LT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031212

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR LI SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19961205

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04Q 1/14 A, 7H 05K 5/02 B, 7H 01R 13/52 B

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR LI SE

1997-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 961205