Global Patent Index - EP 0804098 B1

EP 0804098 B1 2000-07-26 - FILTER FOR TOBACCO SMOKE

Title (en)

FILTER FOR TOBACCO SMOKE

Title (de)

FILTER FÜR TABAKRAUCH

Title (fr)

FILTRE POUR FUMEE DE TABAC

Publication

EP 0804098 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95931495 A

Priority

  • SE 9501004 W
  • SE 9403014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9607335A1] A tobacco smoke filter contains at least one hydrophobic zeolite, and then preferably a zeolite of the faujasite types designated as ST 100, ST 101, ST 102, ST 103 and ST 104, and optionally in combination with other filter material or materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/04 (2006.01); A24D 3/16 (2006.01); B01J 20/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9607335 A1 19960314; AT 194902 T 20000815; AU 3489095 A 19960327; DK 0804098 T3 20001218; EP 0804098 A1 19971105; EP 0804098 B1 20000726; JP H10507630 A 19980728; SE 9403014 D0 19940909

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020917

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: H.F. & PH.F. REEMTSMA GMBH

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SWEDISH MATCH SVERIGE AB TRANSFER- AUSTRIA TABAK S

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK LI

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970409;LV PAYMENT 19970409

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194902 T 20000815

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK LI

1997-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970409;LV PAYMENT 970409