Global Patent Index - EP 0804103 B1

EP 0804103 B1 2000-07-26 - SHOE ASSEMBLY METHOD

Title (en)

SHOE ASSEMBLY METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAU EINES SCHUHES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE CHAUSSURE

Publication

EP 0804103 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96931838 A

Priority

  • FR 9601420 W
  • FR 9511009 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709893A1] The invention relates to a method for assembling a shoe (4), comprising a flexible upper (1) and a rigid sole (2). The method is characterized in that the assembly of the flexible upper (1) and the rigid sole (2) is achieved by using an intermediary part (3) obtained by shaping a flexible material. The method is also characterized in that it comprises at least two steps consisting in: covering a portion of the sole (2) with the intermediary part (3) in order to form a junction surface (12); exerting a pressure outside the shoe (4) in order to press the intermediary part (3) against the sole (2) at the junction surface (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 9/00; A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/16 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0482 (2013.01); A43B 5/0486 (2013.01); A43B 5/0488 (2013.01); A43B 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709893 A1 19970320; AT 194905 T 20000815; DE 69609487 D1 20000831; DE 69609487 T2 20010111; EP 0804103 A1 19971105; EP 0804103 B1 20000726; FR 2738724 A1 19970321; FR 2738724 B1 19971205; US 5875566 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050913

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010906

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010906

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010906

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609487 20000831

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194905 T 20000815

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970410

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI