Global Patent Index - EP 0804112 B1

EP 0804112 B1 2001-04-11 - NOVEL DISPLAY DEVICE FOR SMALL CONTAINERS

Title (en)

NOVEL DISPLAY DEVICE FOR SMALL CONTAINERS

Title (de)

NEUE PRÄSENTATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KLEINBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU DISPOSITIF DE PRESENTATION POUR PETITS FLACONNAGES

Publication

EP 0804112 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96931120 A

Priority

  • FR 9601410 W
  • FR 9510853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709911A1] The invention pertains to the field of mechanics, and more precisely to articles for marketing commercial objects. A display device for small containers is described, which supports and advances said containers as they are sold, characterised in that it is formed of an assembly of two movable parallel strips and of a spring pusher member that slides along a horizontal groove intermediate the strips and abuts against the last container in the row between the two strips. The device is useful for displaying containers for commercial purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709911 A1 19970320; AU 6992296 A 19970401; AU 720918 B2 20000615; CA 2211338 A1 19970320; CN 1168086 A 19971217; DE 69612476 D1 20010517; EP 0804112 A1 19971105; EP 0804112 B1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MBC PREMIUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-07-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL

2001-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MBC PREMIUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: NOVEL DISPLAY DEVICE FOR SMALL CONTAINERS

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990512

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970915

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL