Global Patent Index - EP 0804134 B1

EP 0804134 B1 2001-02-28 - RISING SEAT FOR SEATING INCLUDING TOILETS

Title (en)

RISING SEAT FOR SEATING INCLUDING TOILETS

Title (de)

HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SITZE, UNTER ANDEREM TOILETTENSITZE

Title (fr)

ASSISE ELEVATRICE POUR SIEGE DE TOILETTES

Publication

EP 0804134 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94917070 A

Priority

GB 9401134 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/14 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 69426784 D1 20010405; EP 0804134 A1 19971105; EP 0804134 B1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-07-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426784 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2001-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990608

1998-03-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970821

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT