Global Patent Index - EP 0804201 A4

EP 0804201 A4 2000-04-26 - METHOD OF TREATING OPPORTUNISTIC INFECTIONS WITH AZASPIRANES

Title (en)

METHOD OF TREATING OPPORTUNISTIC INFECTIONS WITH AZASPIRANES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OPPORTUNISTISCHEN INFEKTIONEN MIT AZASPIRANEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES INFECTIONS OPPORTUNISTES AVEC DES AZASPIRANES

Publication

EP 0804201 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95928072 A

Priority

  • GB 9414902 A
  • US 9508915 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9603126A1] Invented is a method of treating opportunistic infections in a mammal, including a human, in need thereof which comprises administering to such mammal an effective amount of a substituted azaspirane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/55; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 221/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/438 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 33/02 (2006.01); C07D 209/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/403 (2013.01); A61K 31/438 (2013.01); A61K 31/454 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9222294 A1 19921223 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 9214462 A1 19920903 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [A] BADGER A M ET AL.: "Effects of SK&F 105685, a novel anti-arthritic agent, on immune function in the dog", INT. J. IMMUNOPHARMACOL., vol. 15, no. 2, 1993, pages 113 - 123, XP002106846
  • [A] BADGER A M ET AL: "BENEFICIAL EFFECTS OF SK&F 105685 IN RAT ADJUVANT ARTHRITIS: PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC EFFECTS ON DISEASE PARAMETER PROGRESSION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, vol. 15, no. 3, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 343 - 347, 349 - 35, XP000677832
  • [A] BADGER A M ET AL: "THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY OF SK&F 105685, A NOVEL AZASPIRANE WITH SUPPRESSOR-CELL INDUCING ACTIVITY", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RHEUMATOLOGY, vol. 11, no. SUPPL. 08, 1 March 1993 (1993-03-01), pages S107 - S109, XP000677527
  • See also references of WO 9603126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9603126 A1 19960208; AU 3190995 A 19960222; AU 684384 B2 19971211; BR 9508332 A 19971104; CA 2195778 A1 19960208; CN 1157564 A 19970820; CZ 286482 B6 20000412; CZ 9700209 A3 19971015; EP 0804201 A1 19971105; EP 0804201 A4 20000426; GB 9414902 D0 19940914; HU 9700201 D0 19970428; HU T77379 A 19980428; JP H10503202 A 19980324; MX 9700626 A 19970531; NO 310096 B1 20010521; NO 970284 A 19970319; NO 970284 D0 19970122; NZ 290974 A 19990830; ZA 9506098 B 19960523

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-12 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970221

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970221