Global Patent Index - EP 0804670 B1

EP 0804670 B1 2000-07-05 - BUILDING ELEMENT

Title (en)

BUILDING ELEMENT

Title (de)

BAUELEMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 0804670 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95936992 A

Priority

  • DK 9500457 W
  • DK 9400435 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9616244A1] A building front element having two opposite and mutually parallel guiding profiles (12, 14) is provided with two frames (22, 24) being displaceable in vertical direction. In addition, and in order to provide a static and dynamic balancing of the displaceable frames (22, 24), the building front element (10) is provided with one further wire (36) forming a cross suspension of the two displaceable frames, said displaceable frames (22, 24) being of the same weight. Thus, one of said wires connects an upper corner at one side of one of the displaceable frames with an upper corner at the opposite side of the other displaceable frame, the wire passing down around the lowermost corners of the lowermost displaceable frame in a closed loop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/18; E05F 1/04; E06B 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 17/00 (2006.01); E06B 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/44 (2013.01); E05D 13/14 (2013.01); E05F 17/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9616244 A1 19960530; DE 69517825 D1 20000810; DK 9400435 U4 19960218; EP 0804670 A1 19971105; EP 0804670 B1 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-14 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-11-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-04-22 [REG DK EGE] RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS: APPROVED

2001-11-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-07-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-07-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-11-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-11-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517825 20000810

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1997-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERSKIND, NIELS

1997-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARILD, JENS

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970617

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE