Global Patent Index - EP 0804680 B1

EP 0804680 B1 2000-04-12 - FORGED OR CAST PISTON HEAD FOR A MULTIPLE COMPONENT PISTON

Title (en)

FORGED OR CAST PISTON HEAD FOR A MULTIPLE COMPONENT PISTON

Title (de)

GESCHMIEDETER ODER GEGOSSENER KOLBENKOPF EINES MEHRTEILIGEN KOLBENS

Title (fr)

TETE FORGEE OU COULEE D'UN PISTON A PLUSIEURS PARTIES

Publication

EP 0804680 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900584 A

Priority

  • DE 19501416 A
  • EP 9600145 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5778846A] PCT No. PCT/EP96/00145 Sec. 371 Date Jul. 3, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Jul. 3, 1997 PCT Filed Jan. 16, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/22459 PCT Pub. Date Jul. 25, 1996In a piston head of a multiple component piston for internal combustion engines, the piston floor continues radially outwards into the ring section which is provided with the piston ring grooves, the supports which carry the hubs are arranged at a distance from the inner face of the ring section and the piston pin which bears the piston shaft can be mounted in the bores of the piston pin boss. An improved manufacture of the piston head is ensured by connecting the ring section with the piston floor via a weld, solder, friction or positive locking joint.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/003 (2013.01); F02F 2003/0061 (2013.01); F02F 2200/04 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0448 (2013.01); F05C 2203/0882 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5778846 A 19980714; DE 19501416 A1 19960725; EP 0804680 A1 19971105; EP 0804680 B1 20000412; WO 9622459 A1 19960725

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070116

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070116

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604960 20000518

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981120

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT