Global Patent Index - EP 0804682 B1

EP 0804682 B1 2001-04-04 - INLET DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

INLET DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

ANSAUGVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ADMISSION POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0804682 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900589 A

Priority

  • DE 19501411 A
  • EP 9600174 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19501411A1] The invention concerns an inlet device (1) for an internal combustion engine. The inlet device in question is provided with an at least partially variable through-aperture by which the inlet behaviour is matched to the operating condition of the engine. To achieve an optimal reduction in noise emission depending on the operating conditions of the engine, the inlet device (1) contains at least one inner pipe (3) and one outer pipe (4). The inlet air stream is drawn irrespective of prevailing operating conditions through the inner pipe (3) and a further air stream is drawn through an additional through-aperture whose size can be varied, between the inner pipe (3) and outer pipe (4). The additional through-aperture is provided with an elastic sealing lip (7, 13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/10; F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/108 (2006.01); F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10118 (2013.01); F02M 35/10301 (2013.01); F02M 35/108 (2013.01); F02M 35/1222 (2013.01); F02M 35/1227 (2013.01); F02M 35/10013 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19501411 A1 19960725; AR 000750 A1 19970806; BR 9606763 A 19980106; CZ 287893 B6 20010314; CZ 9702117 A3 19980715; EP 0804682 A1 19971105; EP 0804682 B1 20010404; JP H10512642 A 19981202; MX 9705226 A 19971031; US 5947072 A 19990907; WO 9622462 A1 19960725; ZA 9600413 B 19960828

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608677 20020314

2001-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-11-08 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2000-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970730

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE