Global Patent Index - EP 0804800 B1

EP 0804800 B1 2001-05-23 - PROTECTION SWITCHING DEVICES WITH A DEVICE FOR FORCIBLE SEPARATION OF MAIN SUPPLY LINES IN PROTECTION SWITCHING DEVICES

Title (en)

PROTECTION SWITCHING DEVICES WITH A DEVICE FOR FORCIBLE SEPARATION OF MAIN SUPPLY LINES IN PROTECTION SWITCHING DEVICES

Title (de)

SCHUTZSCHALTGERÄT MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZWANGSWEISEN TRENNEN VON NETZLEITUNGEN BEI SCHUTZSCHALTGERÄTEN

Title (fr)

APPAREILS DE CONNEXION DE PROTECTION AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE COUPURE AUTOMATIQUE DE LIGNES D'ALIMENTATION POUR APPAREILS DE COUPURE DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 0804800 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945875 A

Priority

  • DE 9602148 W
  • DE 19542690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19542690A1] All switching devices which have the purpose of protecting people or objects from the harmful effects of electric current include at least triggering elements which trigger the appropriate switching mechanisms whenever predetermined threshold values are exceeded. This opens the main current contacts in the switching device, thus usually stopping current flow. However, such switching devices occasionally fail in an emergency situation because, for example, the trigger elements stick, the switching mechanisms jam, the contacts become welded together, or because of other faults. For such eventualities, a device is proposed for forcibly interrupting the appropriate mains or main current lines with a work storage unit. The latter produces a force along a pathway and is kept in an inactive state by a locking mechanism. The locking mechanism can easily be released by a trigger controlled by the switching device and the work storage unit can thus be freed to switch to its active state. A separator device driven by the work storage unit then forcibly separates the current lines. The device is especially suitable for incorporation in or combination with protective switches such as fault current protective switches, automatic cut-outs, bus protection switches, motor protection switches, power protection switches and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/34 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/32 (2006.01); H01H 39/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/34 (2013.01); H01H 9/0072 (2013.01); H01H 9/32 (2013.01); H01H 39/00 (2013.01); H01H 71/501 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542690 A1 19970522; AT 201531 T 20010615; DK 0804800 T3 20010611; EP 0804800 A2 19971105; EP 0804800 A3 19971112; EP 0804800 B1 20010523; ES 2159060 T3 20010916; GR 3036359 T3 20011130; WO 9718571 A2 19970522; WO 9718571 A3 19970807

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161113

2017-02-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-02-02 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20010401211

- Effective date: 20161113

2017-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 201531 T

- Effective date: 20161112

2016-11-16 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161111

2016-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-14 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20161112

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-12-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: PESTALOZZISTRASSE 2 POSTFACH 1416, 8201 SCHAFFHAUSEN (CH)

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061112

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061112

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-11-12 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159060 T3

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-08-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-08-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606956 20010628

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT * RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2001-06-11 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201531 T 20010615

2000-09-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROTECTION SWITCHING DEVICES WITH A DEVICE FOR FORCIBLE SEPARATION OF MAIN SUPPLY LINES IN PROTECTION SWITCHING DEVICES

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990723

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970808

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE