Global Patent Index - EP 0804887 B1

EP 0804887 B1 2000-09-13 - Superstructure for worktables

Title (en)

Superstructure for worktables

Title (de)

Tischaufsatz für Arbeitstische

Title (fr)

Superstructure pour tables de travail

Publication

EP 0804887 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107243 A

Priority

DE 19617536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0804887A1] The attachment has a support surface (14) held above the desk surface (11) of the work desk (10) via a number of height-adjustable spacers (15,19). The support surface has a reduced depth relative to the desk surface. Fold-out sections (16,17) allow it to be extended forwards, to match the depth of the desk surface, to form a standing desk surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/03; A47B 17/03; A47B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 17/03 (2006.01); A47B 19/00 (2006.01); A47B 21/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 17/033 (2013.01); A47B 19/00 (2013.01); A47B 21/03 (2013.01); A47B 2037/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0804887 A1 19971105; EP 0804887 B1 20000913; AT 196226 T 20000915; DE 19617536 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-02-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702333 20001019

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196226 T 20000915

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980416

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI NL SE