Global Patent Index - EP 0805022 B1

EP 0805022 B1 2000-01-19 - Device for advancing webs through rotary printing machines

Title (en)

Device for advancing webs through rotary printing machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fördern von Bahnen durch Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire avancer des bandes dans des machines rotatives d'impression

Publication

EP 0805022 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106797 A

Priority

DE 19617735 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805022A1] The device comprises a lever (10) which is pivotably located on a flange of a drive wheel axially displaceable and fixable on a drive shaft (3). The drive wheel is in slip-free drive connection with the shaft (12) carrying the traction rollers (11) and located in the lever axis-parallel to the drive shaft (3). The lever in a recess encompasses a traverse (21) fixed to the frame. In the recess between the traverse and the lever is a pressure medium-operated work cylinder adjusting the traction rollers to the tractive platen (17). An adjustable stop (26) is arranged, which limits the adjustment of the traction rollers to the tractive platen, ensuring the maintenance of a minimum gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/02; B65H 20/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B41F 13/02 (2013.01); B65H 2402/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805022 A1 19971105; EP 0805022 B1 20000119; DE 19617735 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701025

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120425

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120424

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59701025

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRA?E 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701025 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981214

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980424

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE