Global patent index - EP 0805025 B1

EP 0805025 B1 2000-01-19 - Device for conveying printed products between printing couples

Title (en)

Device for conveying printed products between printing couples

Title (de)

Druckgutfördervorrichtung zwischen Druckwerken

Title (fr)

Dispositif convoyeur des produits imprimés entre des groupes imprimants

Publication

EP 0805025 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107245 A

Priority

DE 19617503 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805025A2] The conveyor device comprises a transport device (5) which has at least one endless conveyor with push members for the printing material. The transport device comprises a fixed section (7) and a movable section (8) and the endless conveyor extends over both sections. A first pivot axis (10) is located in the transition area between the two sections, around which the movable section is pivotably located. The axis runs at right-angles to the conveyor direction of the printing material and horizontally. For access to a first printing mechanism (1), the movable section is pivoted from its work position around the first pivot axis downwards into a release position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/08; B41F 7/16; B41F 13/00; B41F 21/00; B65H 5/02; B65H 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 21/14 (2006.01); B41F 7/16 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 21/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/16 (2013.01); B41F 7/16 (2013.01); B41F 13/00 (2013.01); B41F 21/08 (2013.01); B65H 2511/214 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/214 + B65H 2220/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805025 A2 19971105; EP 0805025 A3 19980107; EP 0805025 B1 20000119; DE 19617503 A1 19971106; ES 2143263 T3 20000501; JP H1059574 A 19980303; US 5950540 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2003-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-12-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-05-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000608

- Year of fee payment: 04

2000-05-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000512

- Year of fee payment: 04

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143263

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59701026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980810

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT