Global Patent Index - EP 0805026 B1

EP 0805026 B1 2000-05-24 - Brazing process for a continuous ink jet printhead

Title (en)

Brazing process for a continuous ink jet printhead

Title (de)

Hartlötverfahren für einen kontinuierlich arbeitenden Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Procédé de brasage fort pour une tête d'impression à jet d'encre continu

Publication

EP 0805026 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302688 A

Priority

US 64006496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805026A1] A brazing process is provided for joining machined resonator portions (1A,1B) to yield a single resonator body (1) for a continuous ink jet printhead. A first resonator body portion (1A) and a second resonator body portion (1B) are provided, each resonator portion having partial fluid ingress (8), fluid egress (9), and nozzle plate (2) channel fluid cavities. A braze preform is then insertable between the first and second resonator body portions to join the first and second resonator body portions. Alignment pins secure and align the first resonator body portion (1A) to the second resonator body portion (1B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/025; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/025 (2006.01); B41J 2/075 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/025 (2013.01); B41J 2202/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805026 A1 19971105; EP 0805026 B1 20000524; AU 1993997 A 19971106; AU 716068 B2 20000217; CA 2203952 A1 19971030; DE 69702090 D1 20000629; DE 69702090 T2 20001221; JP H1034937 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090421

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090421

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080403

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702090 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971208

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB