Global patent index - EP 0805030 B1

EP 0805030 B1 2000-05-10 - Lid heater for a continuous ink-jet printer

Title (en)

Lid heater for a continuous ink-jet printer

Title (de)

Lippenheizelement für kontinuierlich arbeitenden Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Dispostif de chauffage d'une lèvre pour une imprimante à jet d'encre continu

Publication

EP 0805030 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302692 A

Priority

US 64023396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805030A2] Ink concentration changes in continuous ink jet printing systems have been minimized by reducing evaporation rates. This has the effect of also minimizing airflow through the catcher. The reduced catcher flow is not capable of completely removing air around the jets when the eyelid is closed, so this air becomes saturated with water vapor due to localized evaporation from ink drops. This, in turn, causes the air temperature to approach the ink temperature, which is greater than the eyelid seal temperature. The saturated air condenses on the eyelid and, over time, the condensate fills the volume and drips out of the eyelid, or causes shorts to the high voltage electrode. The formation of condensate on the eyelid is eliminated by providing a heater element formed into the eyelid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16508 (2013.01); B41J 2/17503 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805030 A2 19971105; EP 0805030 A3 19980603; EP 0805030 B1 20000510; AU 1993697 A 19971106; AU 714382 B2 19991223; CA 2203953 A1 19971030; DE 69701920 D1 20000615; DE 69701920 T2 20001207; JP H1034963 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140421

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69701920

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140421

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69701920

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130417

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701920

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990810

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980807

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB