Global patent index - EP 0805031 B1

EP 0805031 B1 2000-01-19 - Means for locating an eyelid assembly to a continuous ink jet printhead

Title (en)

Means for locating an eyelid assembly to a continuous ink jet printhead

Title (de)

Mittel zum Positionieren einer Augenlidanordnung an einen kontinuierlich arbeitenden Tintenstrahldruckerkopf

Title (fr)

Moyens pour positionner un assemblage de paupière à une tête d'une imprimante à jet d'encre continu

Publication

EP 0805031 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302695 A

Priority

US 64023596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805031A1] An eyelid assembly (1) is precisely aligned to a catcher (3) in a continuous ink jet printhead (10). An eyelid linkage mechanism (4) associated with the eyelid assembly (1), fastens to the ink jet printhead to provide pivot areas that allow the eyelid assembly to rotate in and out of the catcher (3). A fixture precisely holds and locates the eyelid linkage mechanism to accurately register the eyelid assembly to the catcher. The accurately registered eyelid linkage mechanism is then bonded to the printhead frame, and the eyelid assembly (1) can be secured to the eyelid linkage mechanism (4) using a pivot pin (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16508 (2013.01); B41J 2/1714 (2013.01); B41J 2/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805031 A1 19971105; EP 0805031 B1 20000119; AU 1993297 A 19971106; AU 714037 B2 19991216; CA 2203954 A1 19971030; DE 69701163 D1 20000224; DE 69701163 T2 20000914; JP H1034942 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 09

2005-04-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050401

- Year of fee payment: 09

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69701163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980212

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB