Global Patent Index - EP 0805037 B1

EP 0805037 B1 2000-05-10 - Filter and quick disconnect fitting assembly for an ink jet printhead

Title (en)

Filter and quick disconnect fitting assembly for an ink jet printhead

Title (de)

Filter und schnelltrennbare Anschlussverbindung für einen Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Filtre et raccord déconnectable rapidement pour une tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0805037 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302691 A

Priority

US 64023496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805037A2] A filter assembly is provided for a continuous ink jet printing system, the continuous ink jet printing system having a fluid system and an ink jet printhead. The filter assembly comprises a filter situated in-line with the ink jet printhead and surrounded by a seal. A quick disconnect fitting is provided for capturing the filter housed within the seal to provide an integral quick disconnect filter assembly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B60T 13/14 (2006.01); B60T 13/22 (2006.01); F16D 65/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17563 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0764538 A2 19970326 - SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805037 A2 19971105; EP 0805037 A3 19980520; EP 0805037 B1 20000510; AU 1993897 A 19971106; AU 714373 B2 19991223; CA 2203955 A1 19971030; DE 69701921 D1 20000615; DE 69701921 T2 20001207; JP H1034964 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070421

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070421

2006-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701921 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990810

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980807

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB