Global Patent Index - EP 0805039 B1

EP 0805039 B1 2001-12-12 - Low airflow catcher for continuous ink jet printers

Title (en)

Low airflow catcher for continuous ink jet printers

Title (de)

Tintenauffangvorrichtung mit geringem Luftstrom für kontinuierlich arbeitenden Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Intercepteur à écoulement d'air réduit pour imprimantes à jet d'encre continu

Publication

EP 0805039 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302696 A

Priority

US 64023796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805039A1] An improved catcher device is provided for use with a continuous ink jet printer of the kind for generating a row of parallel selectively charged drop streams catches charged ink drops. The improved catcher device includes a catcher face (20) for receiving selectively charged drops of ink. A catcher radius (28) associated with the catcher face directs the flow of selectively charged drops of ink from the catcher face into a catcher throat (22). The catcher throat is associated with the catcher radius and accepts a flow of selectively charged drops of ink from the catcher radius. The catcher throat (22) has a short, narrow gap (34) with a sudden enlargement (36) downstream of the gap and two converging-diverging channels (33) formed by an elliptical island (30) and elliptical sidewalls. Finally, a catcher vacuum port (26), comprising the catcher face (20), the catcher radius (28), and the catcher throat (22), establishes reduced airflow and returns the selectively charged drops of ink from the printhead to the fluid system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/185

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/185 (2013.01); B41J 2002/1853 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805039 A1 19971105; EP 0805039 B1 20011212; AU 1993197 A 19971106; AU 734900 B2 20010628; AU 734900 C 20020418; CA 2203957 A1 19971030; DE 69708963 D1 20020124; DE 69708963 T2 20020606; JP H1044404 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050401

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708963 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981223

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980212

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB